Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Lorca Quiñones, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1714Born
15 Mar 177358.5AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
18 Apr 177358.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
19 Jan 179378.4DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Lorca Quiñones
Bishop Bernardo Lorca Quiñones O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorcajo de Santiago

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 90, Number 459
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,773, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast