Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Mollinedo

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1716BornBortedo
18 Sep 178064.0AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
26 Nov 178064.2Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
6 Nov 180084.1DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Mollinedo:
Bishop José Luis Mollinedo (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 96, Number 498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013