Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Filippo Ferroni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1744Born
27 Feb 176823.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179752.8SelectedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
18 Dec 179753.0ConfirmedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
21 Dec 179753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
11 Dec 182681.9ResignedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Filippo Ferroni
Bishop Giovanni Filippo Ferroni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBella

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 29
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast