Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Magliola

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1745BornSant'Elpidio
24 Sep 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179752.1SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
18 Dec 179752.3ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
21 Dec 179752.3Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
22 May 181872.7SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
27 Jun 181872.8ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
3 Jan 182983.3DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Magliola:
Bishop Orazio Magliola (born , died ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 61
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013