Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Porró y Reinado

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1739Born
20 Jul 180161.7AppointedBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
15 Nov 180162.0Ordained BishopBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
17 Jan 180363.2AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
3 Jan 181474.2DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Porró y Reinado
Bishop Francisco Porró y Reinado (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 29
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 286, and Page 371
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 120, Number 637

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018