Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentino Vignone

Deceased

Bishop of Diano-Teggiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1805BornSepino
4 Apr 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boiano, Italy
16 Nov 185045.2SelectedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
17 Feb 185145.4ConfirmedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
23 Feb 185145.4Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
1 Nov 185752.1DiedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valentino Vignone (VIAF: 89450288)
Bishop Valentino Vignone (born , died ) Bishop of Diano-Teggiano

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016