Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Ferrigno

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1794Born
19 Dec 181824.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 185056.7SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
17 Feb 185156.9ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
21 Apr 185157.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
29 Jan 185661.9SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
16 Jun 185662.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
20 Apr 187581.1DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Ferrigno (VIAF: 88924792)
Archbishop Raffaele Ferrigno (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 154, and Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast