Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Purpo

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1789Born
18 Dec 181323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sorrento, Italy
13 Mar 184353.2SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
3 Apr 184353.2ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
7 May 184353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
23 Dec 187686.9DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Purpo
Bishop Raffaele Purpo (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorrento
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018