Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Bocci

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1798Born
22 Dec 182123.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 185152.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
24 Feb 185152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
27 Jan 185556.5DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Bocci (VIAF: 89067839)
Bishop Raffaele Bocci (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittÓ della Pieve, Diocese of CittÓ della Pieve
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1851, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast