Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Valenziani

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1811Born
15 Mar 183423.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185847.8AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
2 Jan 185947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
20 Feb 187665.0DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Valenziani (VIAF: 252890583)
Bishop Antonio Maria Valenziani (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017