Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Tolimieri

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1808Born
21 Apr 183223.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 186051.7SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
23 Mar 186051.8ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
22 Apr 186051.8Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
2 Jun 186961.0DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Tolimieri
Bishop Federico Tolimieri (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino, Diocese of Avellino e Frigento
Ordained BishopS. Marie in ara coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017