Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Riccio

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1817Born
5 Jun 184123.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 185941.4SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
20 Jun 185941.6ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
26 Jun 185941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
13 Mar 186042.3SelectedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
23 Mar 186042.4ConfirmedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
9 Nov 187356.0DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Riccio (VIAF: 89439024)
Bishop Luigi Riccio (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168, and Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017