Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio d’Ambrosio, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1799BornSant’Erasmo
29 Jun 182323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 May 185959.6SelectedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
20 Jun 185959.8ConfirmedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
26 Jun 185959.8Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
29 Jan 188383.4DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio d’Ambrosio:
Bishop Francesco Saverio d’Ambrosio O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013