Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Teta

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1817Born
5 Jun 184124.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 185942.0SelectedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
20 Jun 185942.1ConfirmedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
26 Jun 185942.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
11 Feb 187557.7DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Teta
Bishop Giuseppe Teta (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNusco, Diocese of Nusco
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017