Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Striscia (Stiscia)

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1808Born
24 Sep 183123.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 186052.0SelectedBishop of Nusco, Italy
23 Mar 186052.0ConfirmedBishop of Nusco, Italy
22 Apr 186052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
24 Apr 187062.1DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Striscia (Stiscia)
Bishop Gaetano Maria Striscia (Stiscia) (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecalvo, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870, Page 194
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast