Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Maria Barberi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1806³Born
10 May 182922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 May 185447.6SelectedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
23 Jun 185447.7ConfirmedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Jul 185447.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
7 Mar 189184.4DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Maria Barberi
Bishop Giacinto Maria Barberi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSquillace
Ordained BishopSs. Dominique et Sixte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast