Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Sodo

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1811BornNapoli
20 Dec 183423.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185240.8AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
28 Mar 185240.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
6 Apr 185341.9SelectedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
27 Jun 185342.1ConfirmedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
30 Jul 189584.2DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Sodo:
Bishop Luigi Sodo (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 228, and Page 546

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013