Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele de Franco

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1803Born
18 Mar 185248.9AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
28 Mar 185248.9Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
23 Aug 188380.3DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele de Franco
Bishop Raffaele de Franco (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaccuri
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,852, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast