Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Felice Cardinal Cavagnis

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1841Born
19 Sep 186322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
20 Jun 189352.4AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
14 Aug 189655.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
15 Apr 190160.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 190160.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
18 Apr 190160.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
29 Dec 190665.9DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

MicroData Summary for Felice Cavagnis (VIAF: 58093155)
Felice Cardinal Cavagnis (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordogna, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast