Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Ricciardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1814BornNapoli
23 Sep 183723.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 185540.7SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
28 Sep 185541.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
7 Oct 185541.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
24 Nov 187157.4AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
23 Aug 187662.1DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Ricciardi:
Archbishop Mariano Ricciardi (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 480, and Page 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013