Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Formisano

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1811Born
20 Sep 183423.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 185544.0SelectedBishop of Nola, Italy
28 Sep 185544.4ConfirmedBishop of Nola, Italy
7 Oct 185544.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
7 Jan 189078.7DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Formisano (VIAF: 88668450)
Bishop Giuseppe Formisano (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre dell'Annuziata, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017