Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Maria Frascolla

Deceased

Bishop of Foggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1811Born
13 Jun 183523.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 185644.6SelectedBishop of Foggia, Italy
16 Jun 185644.9ConfirmedBishop of Foggia, Italy
22 Jun 185644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
30 Dec 186958.4DiedBishop of Foggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Maria Frascolla (VIAF: 17075850)
Bishop Bernardino Maria Frascolla (born , died ) Bishop of Foggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria
Ordained BishopLe Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017