Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Passero, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1817Born
25 May 183921.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Feb 185638.5SelectedBishop of Troia, Italy
16 Jun 185638.9ConfirmedBishop of Troia, Italy
22 Jun 185638.9Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
8 Sep 189073.1DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Passero
Bishop Tommaso Passero O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta
Ordained BishopLe Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 569
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017