Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Maria Giuseppe de Ferrari, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1804Born
31 Mar 182722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jun 187065.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
3 Jul 187065.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
17 Jul 187469.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Maria Giuseppe de Ferrari (VIAF: 203577203)
Archbishop Giacinto Maria Giuseppe de Ferrari O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Naupactus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOneglia, Diocese of Albenga, Italy
Ordained BishopSte Catherine de Sienne, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017