Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Silvani

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1946 Born
3 Oct 197024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pontremoli, Italy
23 Feb 198841.4IncardinatedPriest of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy
8 May 200760.6AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
29 Jun 200760.8Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Silvani
Bishop Alberto Silvani (born ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirgoletta di Villafranca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Volterra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast