Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Sarti

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1849Born
21 Dec 187223.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189747.6AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
25 Apr 189747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
29 Apr 190959.6AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
7 Nov 191566.1DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Sarti (VIAF: 89411483)
Bishop Andrea Sarti (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRontano, Diocese of Massa Carrara
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 295
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017