Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Rispoli, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1787BornAgerola
10 Jul 180618.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Sep 181124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Oct 182538.1SelectedBishop of Squillace, Italy
13 Mar 182638.5ConfirmedBishop of Squillace, Italy
27 Mar 182638.6Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
18 Sep 183952.0DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Rispoli:
Bishop Andrea Rispoli C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 352
  • bd/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013