Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Barbaroli

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1765³Born
7 Apr 179227.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 181954.2SelectedBishop of Policastro, Italy
4 Jun 181954.3ConfirmedBishop of Policastro, Italy
6 Jun 181954.3Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
1823¹57.9DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Barbaroli
Bishop Gaetano Barbaroli (born , died 1823) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarno

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018