Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Serarcangeli

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1755Born
25 Jul 178025.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181762.2AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
20 Apr 181762.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
11 Jun 183378.3DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Serarcangeli
Bishop Nicola Serarcangeli (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018