Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Faustino Zucchini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1771BornBrescia, Italy
14 Jun 179423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 179524.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 182250.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
21 Apr 182250.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
22 Aug 182857.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

MicroData Summary for Faustino Zucchini
Archbishop Faustino Zucchini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1822, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016