Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloisio San Vitale

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1772Born
31 Dec 179725.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 181744.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
3 Aug 181744.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
21 Nov 183663.9AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
25 Oct 184875.8DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aloisio San Vitale
Bishop Aloisio San Vitale (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1817, Number 23
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018