Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Scribani Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1733BornPiacenza
28 Jul 176127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
28 Jul 181783.7AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
3 Aug 181783.7Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
21 Oct 182389.9DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Scribani Rossi:
Bishop Carlo Scribani Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013