Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ridolfi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1751BornSpoleto, Italy
10 Jun 177524.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181766.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
20 Apr 181766.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
19 Sep 181968.4DiedTitular Bishop of Carystus

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ridolfi
Bishop Francesco Ridolfi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Carystus

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 May 2016