Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabiano Giuseppe Giacomo Luigi Galliani, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1750Born
23 Mar 177625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Oct 181868.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
11 Oct 181868.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
2 Jan 183079.5DiedTitular Bishop of Pergamum

MicroData Summary for Fabiano Giuseppe Giacomo Luigi Galliani
Bishop Fabiano Giuseppe Giacomo Luigi Galliani O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Pergamum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEgli, Italy

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,719
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018