Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco-Maria Coppola

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1773Born
14 Mar 182248.9SelectedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
19 Apr 182249.0ConfirmedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
21 Apr 182249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
11 Dec 185178.6DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco-Maria Coppola
Bishop Francesco-Maria Coppola (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicotera

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,822, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast