Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Paolo Lojudice

Archbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1964 Born
29 Oct 198824.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 May 198924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Mar 201550.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Mar 201550.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
6 Mar 201550.6AppointedVicar General of Ostia, Italy
23 May 201550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
6 May 201954.8AppointedArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
16 Jun 201954.9InstalledArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Paolo Lojudice
Archbishop Augusto Paolo Lojudice (born ) Archbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained DeaconSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 20 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,495
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2019
  • i: CB, 18 May 2019
  • od/c01: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast