Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Simonetta

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1606AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
23 Jul 1606Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
16 Sep 1606AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
19 Jan 1612DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Simonetta (VIAF: 89455118)
Bishop Francesco Simonetta (died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 14
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast