Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Settimio Borsari

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1591AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
30 Nov 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
12 Jun 1592AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
29 Apr 1594DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Settimio Borsari
Bishop Settimio Borsari (died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 103
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 31, Number 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018