Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Galeazzo Moroni

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1573AppointedBishop of Macerata, Italy
10 Jun 1573AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
10 Dec 1586AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
9 Feb 1592ResignedBishop of Recanati, Italy
1 Sep 1613DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Galeazzo Moroni
Bishop Galeazzo Moroni (died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 281
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,093
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast