Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Baroni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
11 Feb 160451.1AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
22 Feb 160451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
31 Aug 161158.6AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
Nov 1612³59.8DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Baroni
Bishop Angelo Baroni O.P. (born 1553, died Nov 1612) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 153, and Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 40, Number 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast