Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio (Pompilio) Servanzi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trevico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1565Born
6 Apr 158620.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Dec 160338.2AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
4 Jan 160438.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
Nov 1607²42.0ResignedBishop of Trevico, Italy
13 Oct 160843.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Trevico, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (Pompilio) Servanzi (VIAF: 89433008)
Bishop Gregorio (Pompilio) Servanzi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trevico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Severino
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCamerino, Diocese of Camerino
Buried Place (Original)San Domenico, Church, Camerino, Diocese of Camerino

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018