Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad Ferdinand Geist von Wildegg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Tricale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1662³BornRavensburg
21 Jan 168522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
3 Jun 168523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 May 169331.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 May 169331.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
9 Aug 169331.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
15 Jan 172259.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad Ferdinand Geist von Wildegg:
Bishop Konrad Ferdinand Geist von Wildegg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 388
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015