Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Joseph von Welden auf Laubheim und Hohenaltingen

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1727BornHohenaltingen
21 Feb 175022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
23 Jan 176941.7SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
12 Jun 176942.1ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
10 Sep 176942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
15 Mar 178860.8DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Joseph von Welden auf Laubheim und Hohenaltingen:
Bishop Ludwig Joseph von Welden auf Laubheim und Hohenaltingen (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013