Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Sigmund Franz von Österreich

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1630BornInnsbruck
21 May 16409.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Nov 164111.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
25 Jun 164615.6SucceededBishop of Augsburg, Germany
2 Nov 165322.9SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
25 Feb 165423.2ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
7 Feb 165928.2AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
28 May 166534.5ResignedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 May 166534.5ResignedBishop of Gurk, Austria
28 May 166534.5ResignedBishop of Trento, Italy
25 Jun 166534.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Franz von Österreich:
Layman Sigmund Franz von Österreich (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013