Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Konrad von Gemmingen

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561²Born
10 May 159231.3Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
18 Nov 159332.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Feb 159433.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Feb 159433.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
2 Apr 159534.2SucceededBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
2 Jul 159534.5Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
7 Nov 161251.8DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Konrad von Gemmingen (VIAF: 42701845)
Bishop Johann Konrad von Gemmingen (born 1561, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGemmingen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt
Death PlaceEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018