Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Laymann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474²Born
150329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
20 Feb 152147.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
20 Feb 152147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
3 Mar 152147.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
Mar 154672.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
11 Jun 155076.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Laymann
Bishop Johann Laymann (born 1474, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolingen
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast