Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonhard Haller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
1528Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
5 Nov 1540AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
5 Nov 1540AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
6 Mar 1541Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
25 Mar 1570DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leonhard Haller:
Bishop Leonhard Haller (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013