Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eberhard von Hirnheim

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1494Born
22 Dec 155258.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
22 Feb 155359.1ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
25 Jun 155359.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
4 Jul 156066.5DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eberhard von Hirnheim (VIAF: 77131104)
Bishop Eberhard von Hirnheim (born 1494, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018