Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523Born
14 Jul 156037.5SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
4 Sep 156037.6ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
18 May 156138.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Jun 159067.4DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Martin von Schaumberg (VIAF: 52484603)
Bishop Martin von Schaumberg (born 1523, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNassenfels
Ordained BishopEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast