Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Fuchs von Rügheim

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1519BornRügheim
25 Aug 155435.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 May 155536.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
22 May 155637.3SucceededBishop of Bamberg, Germany
14 Nov 155738.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
28 Nov 155738.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
22 Mar 156142.1DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Fuchs von Rügheim:
Bishop Georg Fuchs von Rügheim (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 3.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013